THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:26:20 PM
Hofmann, Adam
CPSO#:
89955
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospital Regional De Saint-Jérôme
290 Rue de Montigny
Saint-Jérôme QC J7Z 5T3
Phone: (450) 432-2777
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients may retrieve their medical records from the hospitals where they were treated.
Date Received: 26 May 2014
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADAM HOFMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFMANN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Oct 2008 to 14 Nov 2008
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2017 |