THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:46:28 AM
Dawood, Shamim
CPSO#:
89945
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
MATTHEWS GATE MEDICAL CLINIC
UNIT# 4
3662 HURONTARIO STREET
Mississauga ON L5B 1P3
Phone: 905 232 3600
Fax: (905) 232 2900
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jan 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAMIM DAWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 18 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2011 |