THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 17:17:30 PM
Jain, Amish Kishen Behari
CPSO#:
89944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Nagpur University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Div Neonatal Perinatal Medicine
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:02 Aug 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:02 Aug 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Sep 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
|
Active |