THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:50:51 PM
Sadera, Abhimanyu Jagir Singh
CPSO#:
89941
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
470 Bronte St South
Milton ON L9T 2J4
Phone: (905) 636-0766
Fax: (905) 636-0429
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Abhimanyu Sadera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2013
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABHIMANYU JAGIR SINGH SADERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADERA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 18 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |