THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:54:59 AM
Dadjo-Guewa, Stephane Batowa
CPSO#:
89939
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, French
Education: Shanghai Medical University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Byward Family Health Team
100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 11, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 11, 2021, Hôpital Montfort notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Hôpital Montfort has terminated the hospital appointment of Dr. Stephane Dadjo-Guewa due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
On November 24, 2021, Hôpital Montfort informed the College that Dr. Dadjo-Guewa hospital privileges have been reinstated.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Feb 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANE BATOWA DADJO-GUEWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DADJO-GUEWA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2010 to 25 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2011 |