THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:03:30 AM
Baguio, Arnell Jumawid
CPSO#:
89935
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre /
Stronach Regional Cancer Center
Division of Palliative Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 952-3050
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Feb 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARNELL JUMAWID BAGUIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGUIO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 2011 |