THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 14:11:57 PM
Akintan, Olabode Olanrewaju
CPSO#:
89916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
203C-407 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3T5
Phone: 9053382882
Fax: 9059173522
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:22 Apr 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLABODE OLANREWAJU AKINTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINTAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2009 |