THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 22:24:30 PM
Baker, Blair Albert
CPSO#:
89912
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College, Cork, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 7H6
Phone: 905-878-2383
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Oct 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:10 Oct 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BLAIR ALBERT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2008 to 05 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 05 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2010 |