THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:07:36 AM
Ahooja, Vineeta
CPSO#:
89907
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102-1000 Middlegate Rd
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Phone: 9058047000
Fax: 9058042250
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:17 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Nov 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Nov 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Nov 2010 |
|
Active |