THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:59:10 AM
Boyle, Patrick
CPSO#:
89875
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Rapids Clinic
1150 Pontiac Drive
Sarnia, Ontario.
N7S 3A7
Date Received: 11 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Apr 2022 |