THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 22:40:18 PM
Yeshayahu, Yonatan
CPSO#:
89839
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
03 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Nov 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2008 to 16 Nov 2008
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 03 Sep 2011
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2011 |