THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:23:37 PM
Chacko, Saji Abraham
CPSO#:
89816
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: J. J. M. Medical College, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
207-1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W7
Phone: 416-445-4611
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
North Ajax Medical Clinic
475 Westney Road North
Ajax, ON
L1T 3H4
Tel: 905-427-7767
Date Received: 27 Nov 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Feb 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 28 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 31 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 14 Sep 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 30 Sep 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 29 Apr 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 29 Apr 2022 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)