THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:16:45 AM
Mutasingwa, Donatus Rutajama
CPSO#:
89814
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Swahili
Education: University of Dar Es Salaam, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Med. Teaching Unit
Suite 202
379 Church Street
Markham ON L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472 2200
Fax: (905) 472 5662
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Sep 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONATUS RUTAJAMA MUTASINGWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTASINGWA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2010 |