THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:07:54 AM
Oukachbi, Salima
CPSO#:
89792
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Kabyle
Education: UNIVERSITE D'ALGER, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Hospitalist Service
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6030
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SALIMA OUKACHBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUKACHBI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Aug 2008 to 16 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Nov 2008 to 23 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Aug 2009 to 23 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2011 |