THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:38:38 PM
Faghih, Amir Hossein
CPSO#:
89788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: 807 684 7200
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIR HOSSEIN FAGHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAGHIH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 12 Nov 2008
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2013 |