THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:35:05 PM
Davison, Kelly
CPSO#:
89775
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:21 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2011 to 13 Mar 2011
EL - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jun 2013 |