THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:32:54 PM
Bowry, Ashna Deepak Kumar
CPSO#:
89773
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Swahili
Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Centre at 80 Bond
St Michael's Hospital
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1X2
Phone: (416) 864-3011
Fax: (416) 864-3099
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Sep 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHNA DEEPAK KUMAR BOWRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2010 |