THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:30:53 AM
Saginur, Michael David
CPSO#:
89764
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Department of Paediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4315
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID SAGINUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGINUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2010 to 09 Apr 2010
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2012 |