THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:32:23 PM
Al Faris, Jamila Ali Hassan
CPSO#:
89758
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
19 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Faisal University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 23 Nov 2008
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2008 to 23 Nov 2009
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2009 to 23 Nov 2010
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Nov 2012 |