THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 16:47:33 PM
Safir, Irina
CPSO#:
89739
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Dniepropetrovsk State Medical Academy, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0A8
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Sep 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRINA SAFIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2010 to 27 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2011 |