THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:00:25 PM
Al-Sayegh, Mohammad A J M
CPSO#:
89736
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
10 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: National University of Ireland, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 10 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 11 Aug 2009 to 10 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 11 Aug 2010 to 10 Aug 2011
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2011 |