THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:28:06 PM
Lopez Alonso, Jose Oscar
CPSO#:
89730
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
106-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: 7057262994
Fax: 7057261069
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Sep 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSE OSCAR LOPEZ ALONSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ ALONSO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2008 to 30 Oct 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2008 to 07 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2009 to 07 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2010 to 07 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2011 |