THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:28:56 AM
Sethi, Monica
CPSO#:
89715
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Summerville Family
Medicine Teaching Unit 7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9900
Fax: (905) 272-9977
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Sep 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONICA SETHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |