THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:33:28 PM
Taki, Masanori
CPSO#:
89674
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Kagawa Medical University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2008 to 24 Oct 2008
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2010 |