THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:45:17 PM
Greenwood, Eric David
CPSO#:
89652
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cincinnati, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Jul 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jul 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 04 Mar 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2011 |
|
Active |