THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:46:03 AM
Elrify, Elsaid Ragab Mahmoud
CPSO#:
89643
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ajax & Pickering hospital
Department of Paediatrics
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 4680
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:17 Jul 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
|
Active |