THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:38:39 AM
Wesley, Shannon Jean
CPSO#:
89615
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Apr 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Apr 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Minnesota, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON P7B6L9
Phone: (807) 285 1894
Fax: (807) 285 2094
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Feb 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANNON JEAN WESLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 26 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 27 Jul 2009 to 21 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2010 |