THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:45:46 AM
Rozen, Dima
CPSO#:
89605
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit C8
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 398-1515
Fax: (416) 398-1516
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jul 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2024 |
|
Active |