THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:52:43 AM
Kong, Grace Joanne
CPSO#:
89603
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of London, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: (905) 683-6387
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:08 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRACE JOANNE KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2008 |