THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:18:06 PM
Labib, Yasser Mohamed Aly
CPSO#:
89584
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Department of Anaesthesia
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6290
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Jan 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 20 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
|
Active |