THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 9:39:06 AM
MacLean, Gillian Rowe
CPSO#:
89573
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Rowe, Gillian MacLean (used until: 30 Sep 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:21 Apr 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GILLIAN ROWE MACLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 10 Oct 2017 to 22 Jun 2018
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2017 |