THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:04:29 PM
Izadpanah, Parnam
CPSO#:
89572
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital gate
Oakville ON L6J 3L7
Phone: (905) 338-4372
Fax: (905) 338-4372
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:31 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PARNAM IZADPANAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZADPANAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jun 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2014 |