THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 20:07:06 PM
Kelley, Simon Paul
CPSO#:
89560
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Birmingham, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Room S107 Elm Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6435
Fax: (416) 813-6414
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jul 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:06 Jul 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
|
Active |