THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:36:36 AM
Loubani, Tarek Mahmoud
CPSO#:
89554
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Spanish
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAREK MAHMOUD LOUBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUBANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Jul 2008
EL - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: November 15, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Tarek Loubani was charged with the following offence:
1. Mischief under $5,000, on or about October 22, 2023, contrary to section 430 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: November 15, 2023
Place of Charge: London, Ontario
London Police Service