THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:57:08 AM
Mireskandari, Kamiar
CPSO#:
89493
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7403
Fax: (416) 813-8266
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:01 Oct 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Mar 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2015 |
|
Active |