THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:02:46 AM
Chong, Aun Yeong
CPSO#:
89458
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696 7280
Fax: (613) 696 7245
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:29 May 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2021 |
|
Active |