THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:46:09 AM
Khawaja, Saba Zahoor
CPSO#:
89371
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ul Haq, Saba Zahoor (used until: 15 Dec 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-2620 Simcoe St N
Windfields Pharmacy & Medical Centr
Oshawa ON L1L 0R1
Phone: 905 432 9463
Fax: 18449274526
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SABA ZAHOOR KHAWAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAWAJA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2014 |