THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:05:58 AM
Roifman, Maian
CPSO#:
89365
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
525 University Avenue
Suite 940
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-586-4523
Fax: 416-813-5345
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:03 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAIAN ROIFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROIFMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2011 to 20 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2015 |