THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:46:30 AM
Hickey, Edward John Brendan
CPSO#:
89354
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Southampton, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Texas Children's Hospital
6651 Main St
Legacy Tower, 19th Floor
Houston TX 77030
United States
Phone: 8328241000 Ext. 62561
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Edward Hickey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD JOHN BRENDAN HICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jan 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2017 |