THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:37:23 PM
Grace, Richard Joseph Alexander
CPSO#:
89343
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Dundee, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Clinic
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON K9J 7B3
Phone: (705)-876-4545
Fax: (705)-743-1449
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD JOSEPH ALEXANDER GRACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRACE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |