THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:19:45 AM
Thyagu, Santhosh
CPSO#:
89340
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: University of Kerala, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Haematology/Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5706
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:13 Jul 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2020 |
|
Active |