THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:50:43 AM
Nita, Dragos Alexandru
CPSO#:
89300
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Romanian
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
NeuroCare - NN&BH
Suite 401
1110 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: (416) 224-0056
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DRAGOS ALEXANDRU NITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2014 |