THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:47:59 AM
Momi, Rajinder Singh
CPSO#:
89282
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Department of Psychiatry
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5028
Fax: (705) 876-5013
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJINDER SINGH MOMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOMI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2010 |