THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:53:19 AM
Balla, Agneta
CPSO#:
89263
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian, Romanian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orléans ON K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AGNETA BALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 02 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2011 |