THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:12:41 AM
Chow, Signy
CPSO#:
89260
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4757
Fax: 416-480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIGNY CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 18 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 2014 |