THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:33:46 AM
Bombin, Victoria Elisa
CPSO#:
89259
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Victoria Bombin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patient records stayed with the owner of the clinic, Mr. George Oduro, Pharmacist. Patients may write to the clinic address at Rymal Medical Clinic, 2247 Rymal Road, Stoney Creek, ON L8J 2V8. If unsuccessful, please contact the College of Pharmacists and/or the Information and Privacy Commissioners Office.
Date Received: 28 Aug 2015
Instructions/Address:Please send requests to the address above.
Rymal Medical Clinic
2247 Rymal Road
Stoney Creek ON L8J 2V8
Attention: Record Request Dr. Bombin
Date Received: 10 Nov 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Mar 2014 |