THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:00:24 AM
Esken, Martin
CPSO#:
89210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1E-174
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN ESKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESKEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2010 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2013 |