THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:29:36 AM
Ratnasingam, Ranjith Kumar
CPSO#:
89193
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Charles Univ Prague, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-444 Concession St
Hamilton ON L9A 1C2
Phone: 905-577-0667
Fax: 905-577-0259
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RANJITH KUMAR RATNASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATNASINGAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2013 |