THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:09:18 AM
Patel, Alkesh
CPSO#:
89180
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: University College, Cork, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5220 Dundas Street
Units D9-D11
Burlington ON L7L 0J4
Phone: 289-337-3090
Fax: 289-337-1320
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALKESH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2015 |