THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:24:19 AM
Kelly, Emily Ruth
CPSO#:
89172
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
South Huron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jan 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILY RUTH KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2011 |